US HB4197 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
All Circuit Review Extension Act - Extends from two to five years after the effective date of the Whistleblower Protection Enhancement Act of 2012 (i.e., December 27, 2012), the period allowed for: (1) filing a petition for judicial review of Merit Systems Protection Board decisions in whistleblower cases, and (2) any review of such a decision by the Director of the Office of Personnel Management (OPM).
Title
All Circuit Review Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-170. |
2014-09-26 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-09-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5570) |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 506. |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-07-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6161) |
2014-07-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4197. |
2014-07-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6161-6162) |
2014-07-14 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-07-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 390. |
2014-07-14 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2014-07-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-519, Part I. |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2014-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Labor-management relations
Merit Systems Protection Board
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Labor-management relations
Merit Systems Protection Board