US HB4176 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 129-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To improve Federal population surveys by requiring the collection of voluntary, self-disclosed information on sexual orientation and gender identity in certain surveys, and for other purposes.
Title
LGBTQI+ Data Inclusion Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - On passage (Y: 220 N: 201 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 202 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - House - On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendment (A003) H.Amdt.241 (Y: 213 N: 201 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - On agreeing to the Jackson Lee amendment (A002) H.Amdt.240 (Y: 216 N: 200 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 202 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - House - On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendment (A003) H.Amdt.241 (Y: 213 N: 201 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - On agreeing to the Jackson Lee amendment (A002) H.Amdt.240 (Y: 216 N: 200 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-06-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-23 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 201 (Roll no. 296). (text: CR H5856) |
2022-06-23 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 218 (Roll no. 295). |
2022-06-23 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2022-06-23 | House | Mr. Biggs moved to recommit to the Committee on Oversight and Reform. (text: CR H5869) |
2022-06-23 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-06-23 | House | H.Amdt.241 On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendment (A003) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 213 - 201 (Roll no. 294). |
2022-06-23 | House | H.Amdt.240 On agreeing to the Jackson Lee amendment (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 200 (Roll no. 293). |
2022-06-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5867-5871) |
2022-06-23 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, further proceedings on H.R. 4176 are postponed. |
2022-06-23 | House | H.Amdt.242 On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2022-06-23 | House | H.Amdt.242 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A004) pursuant to the rule. |
2022-06-23 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1191, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Carolyn B. Maloney amendment No. 3. |
2022-06-23 | House | H.Amdt.242 Amendment (A004) offered by Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. (consideration: CR H5867; text: CR H5867) |
2022-06-23 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Carolyn B. Maloney amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Comer demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-06-23 | House | H.Amdt.241 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2022-06-23 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1191, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Carolyn B. Maloney amendment No. 2. |
2022-06-23 | House | H.Amdt.241 Amendment (A003) offered by Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. (consideration: CR H5866-5867; text: CR H5866) |
2022-06-23 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Jackson Lee amendment No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Comer demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-06-23 | House | H.Amdt.240 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2022-06-23 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1191, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Jackson Lee amendment No. 1. |
2022-06-23 | House | H.Amdt.240 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Jackson Lee. (consideration: CR H5862-5866; text: CR H5862) |
2022-06-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4176. |
2022-06-23 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4176, H.R. 5585 and H.R. 7666. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 4176, H.R. 5585 and H.R. 7666. Rule provides for one motion to recommit each for H.R. 4176, H.R. 5585 and H.R. 7666. Rule provides that proceedings may be postponed through July 15, 2022, on measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of June 21, 2022, June 22, 2022, June 23, 2022, or June 24, 2022, and on which the yeas and nays were ordered. |
2022-06-23 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1191. (consideration: CR H5856-5867) |
2022-06-21 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1191 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4176, H.R. 5585 and H.R. 7666. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 4176, H.R. 5585 and H.R. 7666. Rule provides for one motion to recommit each for H.R. 4176, H.R. 5585 and H.R. 7666. Rule provides that proceedings may be postponed through July 15, 2022, on measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of June 21, 2022, June 22, 2022, June 23, 2022, or June 24, 2022, and on which the yeas and nays were ordered. |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 289. |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 117-378. |
2022-06-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16. |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2287 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HR1191 (Related) 2022-06-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1191 (Related) 2022-06-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.