US HB4165 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-120.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-120.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Water Resources Development Act of 2000 to extend through December 31, 2010, the authority of the Secretary of the Army to accept and expend funds contributed by non-federal public entities to expedite the evaluation of permits under the jurisdiction of the Department of the Army.
Title
To extend through December 31, 2010, the authority of the Secretary of the Army to accept and expend funds contributed by non-Federal public entities to expedite the processing of permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Baird [D-WA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] |
Rep. Jay Inslee [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Daniel Lungren [R-CA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. David Wu [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-22 | Became Public Law No: 111-120. | |
2009-12-22 | Signed by President. | |
2009-12-14 | Presented to President. | |
2009-12-11 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-12-10 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-12-10 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12969) | |
2009-12-09 | Received in the Senate, read twice. | |
2009-12-08 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-12-08 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H13580) | |
2009-12-08 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4165. | |
2009-12-08 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13579-13581) | |
2009-12-08 | Mr. Larsen (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-12-02 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. | |
2009-12-01 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4162 (Related) 2009-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Navigation, waterways, harbors
State and local finance
Water resources development
Licensing and registrations
Navigation, waterways, harbors
State and local finance
Water resources development