US HB4082 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prevent catastrophic wildland fires by establishing a commission to study and recommend wildland fire prevention, mitigation, suppression, management, and rehabilitation policies for the Federal Government, and for other purposes.
Title
Wildland Fire Mitigation and Management Commission Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Armed Services, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2150 (Same As) 2022-06-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 427.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4082/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4082/BILLS-117hr4082ih.pdf |