US SB2150 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to prevent catastrophic wildland fires by establishing a commission to study and recommend wildland fire prevention, mitigation, suppression, management, and rehabilitation policies for the Federal Government, and for other purposes.
Title
Wildland Fire Mitigation and Management Commission Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 427. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-121. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4082 (Same As) 2021-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.