US HB4077 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Quality Health Care Coalition Act of 2014 - Exempts health care professionals, including individuals and entities, from federal and state antitrust laws in connection with negotiations with a health plan regarding contract terms under which the professionals provide health care items or services for which plan benefits are provided. Declares that this Act: (1) applies only to health care professionals excluded from the National Labor Relations Act; and (2) does not apply to such negotiations relating to Medicare or Medicaid programs, the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP, formerly known as SCHIP), medical and dental care for members of the uniformed services, veterans' medical care, the federal employees health benefits program, or the Indian Health Care Improvement Act.
Title
Quality Health Care Coalition Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2300 (Related) 2013-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB1851 (Related) 2013-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1851 (Related) 2013-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4077/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4077/BILLS-113hr4077ih.pdf |