US HB407 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clean Vehicles Incentive Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow certain businesses located in areas designated as nonattainment areas under the Clean Air Act a general business tax credit for the cost of certain clean-fuel vehicle property and the use of clean-burning fuel. Allows the credit to be taken against regular and alternative minimum tax liabilities. Allows a tax deduction for any unused clean fuel credit amounts. Allows a new qualified hybrid motor vehicle tax credit for any taxable year after 2012 only for such a vehicle which is placed in service after December 31, 2012, by an eligible business and substantially all of the use of which is in a nonattainment area. Extends such credit to new hybrid vehicles purchased after: (1) December 31, 2009, and before January 1, 2013, or (2) December 31, 2012, and before January 1, 2018.
Title
Clean Vehicles Incentive Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Subjects
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Taxation
Alternative and renewable resources
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/407/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr407/BILLS-113hr407ih.pdf |