US HB4048 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To impose sanctions and other measures in response to the failure of the Government of the People's Republic of China to allow an investigation into the origins of COVID-19 at suspect laboratories in Wuhan.
Title
COVID–19 Origins Accountability Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2148 (Related) 2021-06-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB3463 (Related) 2022-01-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
SB3463 (Related) 2022-01-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4048/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4048/BILLS-117hr4048ih.pdf |