US HB3926 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-0)
Status: Introduced on November 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gun Violence Research Act This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to specifically include injuries from gun violence as a research subject for the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC). Nothing in the CDC's research authorization may be construed to authorize support for advocacy or promotion of gun control. The CDC must improve the National Violent Death Reporting System, particularly through the voluntary participation of additional states. Nothing in the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act may be construed to prohibit a health care provider from discussing guns or gun safety with a patient or reporting a patient's threat of violence.
Title
Gun Violence Research Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-11-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-11-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2994 (Related) 2015-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1738 (Related) 2015-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1738 (Related) 2015-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime victims
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Violent crime
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3926/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3926/BILLS-114hr3926ih.pdf |