US HB2994 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Safer Communities Act of 2015 This bill provides grants to expand mental health crisis assistance programs, to support comprehensive school mental health programs, and to enhance mental health and substance abuse needs of prison inmates. The bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services to expand research on violence associated with mental illness and substance abuse disorders. It requires the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to expand the National Violent Death Reporting System to all 50 states and to research the causes, mechanisms, prevention, diagnosis, and treatment of injuries from gun violence. The bill states that no provision of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act prohibits physicians from asking patients about guns in their homes, speaking to a patient about gun safety, or reporting a patient's threat of violence. It amends the Gun Control Act of 1968 to specify that the term "committed to a mental institution" applies to involuntary inpatient or outpatient treatment. The bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to permit the Department of Justice (DOJ) to award grants to states to remove firearms from individuals who pose a threat to themselves or others. DOJ must promptly notify law enforcement agencies when a prohibited person attempts to purchase a firearm. The bill replaces statutory references to persons "adjudicated as a mental defective" with persons "adjudicated as ineligible due to disqualifying mental status." It amends the NICS Improvement Amendments Act of 2007 to: establish procedures to restore firearm ownership rights after a mental health adjudication or commitment, require an annual report on record submissions due to domestic violence misdemeanor convictions, authorize state grants to improve the automation and transmittal of mental health and criminal history records, and require quarterly updates to federal agency record submissions. The bill reauthorizes the National Criminal History Records Improvement Program for FY2016-FY2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safer Communities Act of 2015

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2015-07-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2015-07-09HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
2015-07-09HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2015-07-09HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2015-07-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1738 (Related) 2015-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3926 (Related) 2015-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Assault and harassment offenses
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Child health
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Health and Human Services
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Evidence and witnesses
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Intergovernmental relations
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Performance measurement
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Right of privacy
Specialized courts
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' medical care
Violent crime

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback