US HB391 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates transparency requirements for ethics waivers (i.e., waivers from the requirement to sign an ethics pledge) issued to executive branch appointees. Specifically, such ethics waivers must be transmitted to the Office of Government Ethics and made publicly available online.
Title
White House Ethics Transparency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Corporate finance and management
Federal officials
Financial services and investments
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Federal officials
Financial services and investments
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/391/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr391/BILLS-116hr391ih.pdf |