US HB3887 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title III of the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the program of payments to children's hospitals that operate graduate medical education programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Children’s Hospital GME Support Reauthorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] |
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Keith Self [R-TX] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. George Santos [R-NY] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] |
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 17. |
2023-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 15 - 12. |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3887/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3887/BILLS-118hr3887ih.pdf |