US HB3881 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cooperative Management of Mineral Rights Act of 2016 This bill repeals requirements of the Mineral Leasing Act and the Energy Policy Act of 1992 regarding the development of oil and gas deposits on certain lands within the Allegheny National Forest in Pennsylvania. Nothing in this bill shall be construed or interpreted as: limiting, modifying, or otherwise affecting the existing requirement to provide in writing 60-day advance notice of specific activities in accordance with the order dated December 16, 1980, in the case of United States of America v. Minard Run Oil Company; or limiting existing authority of the Forest Service to protect the national forests.
Title
Cooperative Management of Mineral Rights Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 395 N: 3 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 395 N: 3 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 395 N: 3 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2016-09-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 3 (Roll no. 480). (text: CR H5063) |
2016-09-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5072) |
2016-09-06 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-09-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3881. |
2016-09-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5063-5064) |
2016-09-06 | House | Mr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 550. |
2016-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-711. |
2016-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-14 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2016-04-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2015-11-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-11-03 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7396-7397) |
2015-11-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Oil and gas
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Government information and archives
Oil and gas
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources