US HB3557 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase transparency, accountability, and community engagement within the Department of Homeland Security, provide independent oversight of border security activities, improve training for agents and officers of U.S. Customs and Border Protection and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and for other purposes.
Title
Homeland Security Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-05-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3160 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3557/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3557/BILLS-117hr3557ih.pdf |