US HB3499 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide direct hire authority to appoint individuals to Federal wildland firefighting and firefighting support positions in the Forest Service or the Department of the Interior, and for other purposes.
Title
Direct Hire To Fight Fires
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Kevin Kiley [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 0. |
2023-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-26 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2023-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-05-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-05-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3268 (Related) 2023-11-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3499/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3499/BILLS-118hr3499ih.pdf |