US HB3486 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Education to deem each month for which certain Federal student loans are in deferment during a period of active duty service as months counted toward public service loan forgiveness.
Title
Recognizing Military Service in PSLF Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] |
Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1480 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HR774 (Similar To) 2021-11-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HR774 (Similar To) 2021-11-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3486/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3486/BILLS-117hr3486ih.pdf |