US HB3477 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ceiling Fan Energy Conservation Harmonization Act This bill makes January 21, 2020, the compliance date for the amended energy conservation standards for ceiling fan light kits, which is also the compliance date for ceiling fan standards. Currently, the compliance date for the ceiling fan light kits is January 7, 2019.
Title
Ceiling Fan Energy Conservation Harmonization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-30 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-07 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2030 (Same As) 2018-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-161. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Energy
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Lighting and heating
Department of Energy
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Lighting and heating
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3477/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3477/BILLS-115hr3477ih.pdf |