US HB3452 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to eliminate copayments by the Department of Veterans Affairs for medicines relating to preventive health services, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans Preventive Health Coverage Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1779 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3452/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3452/BILLS-117hr3452ih.pdf |