US HB3432 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses pipeline safety with respect to natural gas and hazardous liquid pipelines. Among other things, the bill reauthorizes appropriations through FY2023 for pipeline safety activities; prioritizes assessment methods for transmission pipelines that can provide a greater level of safety than direct assessment, including the use of internal inspection devices or pressure testing; makes it mandatory for each operator of a transmission pipeline facility in a high consequence area to install automatic or remote shutoff valves; directs owners and operators of gas or hazardous liquid pipeline facilities to make critical operational information available to surrounding communities and first responders; increases civil penalties for violations and revises the criminal penalty standard from "knowingly and willfully" to "knowingly or recklessly"; and requires the Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration to submit an annual report to Congress detailing its efforts to hire women, minorities, and veterans as inspectors since January 1, 2012.
Title
Safer Pipelines Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-06-26 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-06-16 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Energy Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4700 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB5120 (Related) 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 545.
HB5120 (Related) 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 545.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crimes against property
Department of Transportation
Emergency planning and evacuation
First responders and emergency personnel
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Minority employment
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women's employment
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crimes against property
Department of Transportation
Emergency planning and evacuation
First responders and emergency personnel
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Minority employment
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3432/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3432/BILLS-116hr3432ih.pdf |