US HB5120 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 545.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 545.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses pipeline safety with respect to natural gas and hazardous liquid pipelines. Among other things, the bill reauthorizes appropriations through FY2023 for pipeline safety activities; prioritizes assessment methods for transmission pipelines that can provide a greater level of safety than direct assessment, including the use of internal inspection devices or pressure testing; makes it mandatory for each operator of a transmission pipeline facility in a high consequence area to install automatic or remote shutoff valves; directs owners and operators of gas or hazardous liquid pipeline facilities to make critical operational information available to surrounding communities and first responders; increases civil penalties for violations and revises the criminal penalty standard from knowingly and willfully to knowingly or recklessly; requires advanced leak-detection that can identify leak locations and amounts released on gas pipelines; and directs the Department of Transportation to finalize a rule on gas gathering lines.
Title
SAFER Pipelines Act of 2019 Safe, Accountable, Fair, and Environmentally Responsible Pipelines Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 545. |
2020-12-17 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-12-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-661, Part I. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-20 | House | Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged. |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3432 (Related) 2019-11-20 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
HB4700 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB4700 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Building construction
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Transportation
Earth sciences
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee hiring
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
First responders and emergency personnel
Geography and mapping
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Members of Congress
Minority employment
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Pollution liability
Research administration and funding
Research and development
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Transportation and public works
Transportation costs
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Women's employment
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Building construction
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Transportation
Earth sciences
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee hiring
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
First responders and emergency personnel
Geography and mapping
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Members of Congress
Minority employment
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Pollution liability
Research administration and funding
Research and development
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Transportation and public works
Transportation costs
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Women's employment