US HB3379 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows biosimilars to be marketed five years after the reference brand-name biological product is licensed. Currently, brand-name biological products are provided a 12-year marketing-exclusivity period. This shortened marketing-exclusivity period applies only to biological products licensed by the Food and Drug Administration after enactment of this bill.
Title
PRICED Act Price Relief, Innovation, and Competition for Essential Drugs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Health
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Health
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3379/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3379/BILLS-116hr3379ih.pdf |