US SB4796 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Care Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Care Act of 2020

Sponsors

Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB803 (Related) 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1035 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1418 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2038 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB3062 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3379 (Related) 2019-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3708 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB4159 (Related) 2019-08-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4400 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4850 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB4932 (Related) 2019-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5201 (Related) 2020-07-15 - Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
HB5304 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5668 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6005 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7676 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB8098 (Related) 2020-08-25 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8473 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB350 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB657 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB659 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1125 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2741 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2999 (Related) 2019-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4106 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4675 (Related) 2020-10-23 - Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate.
HB8527 (Same As) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects

Abortion
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Aging
Alternative treatments
Appropriations
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Biological and life sciences
Business records
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Contracts and agency
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Dental care
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Immunology and vaccination
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax rates
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Inflation and prices
Insurance industry and regulation
Intellectual property
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Marketing and advertising
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical ethics
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Retail and wholesale trades
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Telephone and wireless communication
User charges and fees
Women's health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback