US HB3369 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-11-1)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hmong Veterans' Service Recognition Act - Authorizes burial in any open national cemetery under the control of the National Cemetery Administration of the remains of any individual: (1) who was naturalized pursuant to the Hmong Veterans' Naturalization Act of 2000 and who resided in the United States at the time of death; or (2) who the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) determines served with a special guerrilla unit or irregular forces operating from a base in Laos in support of the U.S. Armed Forces between February 28, 1961, and May 7, 1975, and who, at the time of death, resided in the United States and was a U.S. citizen or an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence.
Title
Hmong Veterans' Service Recognition Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2013-10-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2337 (Same As) 2014-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3031)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Laos
Military personnel and dependents
Vietnam
Asia
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Laos
Military personnel and dependents
Vietnam
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3369/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3369/BILLS-113hr3369ih.pdf |