US HB3344 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Star Print ordered on the bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Star Print ordered on the bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prioritize the efforts of and enhance coordination among United States agencies to encourage countries in Central and Eastern Europe to improve the security of their telecommunications networks, and for other purposes.
Title
Transatlantic Telecommunications Security Act
Sponsors
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] |
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 366 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the bill. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2022-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 366 - 60 (Roll no. 133). (text: CR H4538-4540) |
2022-04-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4557) |
2022-04-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-04-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3344. |
2022-04-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4538-4541) |
2022-04-27 | House | Mr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-05-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber. |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E555) |
2021-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2876 (Related) 2021-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.