US HB3341 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Visa Improvements to Stimulate International Tourism to the United States of America Act or the VISIT USA Act - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide qualifying nationals of China (PRC) with a five-year multiple entry/exit visitor visa. Requires such persons to be screened through the automated electronic travel authorization system. Transfers authority to establish and collect the premium fee for employment-based petitions and applications from the Attorney General (DOJ) to the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS). Directs the Secretary of State to: (1) offer for a fee premium visitor visa processing; (2) develop, subject to security concerns, a pilot program for processing visitor visas using secure remote videoconferencing technology to conduct visa interviews; and (3) decrease nonimmigrant visa application and issuance fees in selected countries when there is a low demand from such countries for visitor visas. Establishes a W (nonimmigrant)-visa for: (1) a Canadian citizen who is older than 50 years of age and owns a U.S. residence or has rented a U.S. accommodation for the duration of his or her stay; and (2) such alien's accompanying spouse and children. Makes such visa renewable every three years with a maximum stay of 240 consecutive days in each authorized period. Revises the visa waiver program to: (1) authorize the Secretary of Homeland Security to designate any country as a program country; (2) adjust visa refusal rate criteria, including addition of a 3% maximum overstay rate; and (3) revise probationary and termination provisions. Establishes an X (nonimmigrant)-visa for: (1) an alien who invests (and maintains) at least $500,000 in U.S. residential real estate, of which at least $250,000 must be for a U.S. primary residence where such person will reside for more than 180 days per year; and (2) such alien's accompanying spouse and children. Makes such visa renewable every three years. Amends the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 to direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to include in the Global Entry Trusted Traveler Network individuals who meet security requirements and are employed and sponsored by an international organization which maintains a strong working relationship with the United States.
Title
Visa Improvements to Stimulate International Tourism to the United States of America Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Mary Bono Mack [R-CA] |
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. David Dreier [R-CA] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement. |
2011-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2011-11-03 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2011-11-03 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2011-11-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2011-11-03 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2007-2008) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1746 (Same As) 2011-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2233 (Related) 2012-03-27 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees and Border Security . Hearings held.
SB2233 (Related) 2012-03-27 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees and Border Security . Hearings held.
Subjects
Asia
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
China
Congressional oversight
Housing finance and home ownership
Immigration
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
China
Congressional oversight
Housing finance and home ownership
Immigration
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3341/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3341/BILLS-112hr3341ih.pdf |