US SB2233 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees and Border Security . Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees and Border Security . Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jobs Originated through Launching Travel Act or the JOLT Act - Authorizes the Secretary of State to modify or enter into agreements with certain countries on a nonreciprocal basis to allow for longer visa validity periods. Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to transfer authority to establish and collect the premium fee for employment-based petitions and applications from the Attorney General (DOJ) to the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS). Directs the Secretary of State to: (1) offer for a fee premium visitor visa processing (absent security concerns, within three business days of visa request); (2) decrease nonimmigrant visa application and issuance fees in selected countries when there is a low demand from such countries for visitor visas; and (3) conduct interviews and review applications within 15 days after an applicant's appointment request, and within one year after enactment of this Act, within 10 days after such request. States that the premium fee shall be sufficient to cover costs for: (1) processing such visas in China, India, and Brazil; and (2) creating mobile units to process applications and conduct interviews in large cities that do not have a U.S. embassy or consulate. Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security to admit into the United States a qualifying Canadian citizen over 50 years old and spouse and children, for a period of at least 240 days, if the person owns a U.S. residence or has rented a U.S. accommodation for the duration of such stay. Revises the visa waiver program to: (1) authorize the Secretary of Homeland Security to designate any country as a program country; (2) adjust visa refusal rate criteria, including addition of a 3% maximum overstay rate; and (3) revise probationary and termination provisions. Amends the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 to direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to include in the Global Entry Trusted Traveler Network individuals who meet security requirements and are employed and sponsored by an international organization which maintains a strong working relationship with the United States. Prohibits enrollment in the Network of a person who is a citizen of a state sponsor of terror as defined in the Comprehensive Iran Sanctions, Accountability, and Divestment Act of 2010.
Title
Jobs Originated through Launching Travel Act
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Herb Kohl [D-WI] |
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees and Border Security . Hearings held. |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3855 (Related) 2012-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
SB2046 (Related) 2012-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3341 (Related) 2011-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
HB5741 (Related) 2012-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
SB3199 (Related) 2012-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2046 (Related) 2012-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3341 (Related) 2011-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
HB5741 (Related) 2012-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
SB3199 (Related) 2012-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Asia
Border security and unlawful immigration
Brazil
Canada
China
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
India
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial review and appeals
Latin America
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Administrative remedies
Asia
Border security and unlawful immigration
Brazil
Canada
China
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
India
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial review and appeals
Latin America
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/2233/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s2233/BILLS-112s2233is.pdf |