US HB3299 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide for equal treatment of same sex married couples. It permits such couples to amend their filing status to married filing jointly for tax returns outside of the statute of limitations and modifies tax rules relating to married couples to include same sex couples.
Title
PRIDE Act of 2019 Promoting Respect for Individuals' Dignity and Equality Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7313-7316) |
2019-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3299. |
2019-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7313-7318) |
2019-07-24 | House | Ms. Chu, Judy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 120. |
2019-07-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-161. |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1244 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3294 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB515 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1940 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3294 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB515 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1940 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Marriage and family status
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Marriage and family status
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation