US HB1244 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several tax provisions that refer to married couples to make the provisions equally applicable to legally married same-sex couples.
Title
Equal Dignity for Married Taxpayers Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB515 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3294 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3299 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
SB1940 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3294 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3299 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
SB1940 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Marriage and family status
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1244/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1244/BILLS-116hr1244ih.pdf |