US HB3159 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish requirements for quality and discard dates that are voluntarily declared on the food label.
Title
Food Date Labeling Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] |
Rep. Wiley Nickel [D-NC] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D-OR] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Brandon Williams [R-NY] | Rep. Morgan McGarvey [D-KY] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry. |
2023-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1840 (Related) 2023-03-28 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, House Administration, and Oversight and Accountability, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1016 (Related) 2023-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB1484 (Same As) 2023-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1016 (Related) 2023-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB1484 (Same As) 2023-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3159/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3159/BILLS-118hr3159ih.pdf |