US HB3126 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Healthcare Fairness Act of 2013 - Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to prohibit the expenditure of federal funds to pay any portion of the premium for a health plan purchased by a Member of Congress pursuant to the Act.
Title
Healthcare Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3067 (Related) 2013-09-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB3066 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3071 (Related) 2013-09-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB3198 (Related) 2013-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3066 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3071 (Related) 2013-09-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB3198 (Related) 2013-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Members of Congress
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Members of Congress
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3126/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3126/BILLS-113hr3126ih.pdf |