US HB3063 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend titles XIX and XXI of the Social Security Act to improve Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program for low-income mothers.
Title
MOMMIES Act Maximizing Outcomes for Moms through Medicaid Improvement and Enhancement of Services Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1542 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7585 (Related) 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7585 (Related) 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3063/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3063/BILLS-117hr3063ih.pdf |