US HB3037 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make available necessary disaster assistance for families affected by major disasters, and for other purposes.
Title
Housing Survivors of Major Disasters Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473. |
2022-12-20 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2022-12-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-653, Part I. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2021-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-05-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |