US HB298 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to expand access to capital for rural-area small businesses, and for other purposes.
Title
Expanding Access to Capital for Rural Job Creators Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA] | Rep. John Rose [R-TN] | Rep. Russell Fry [R-SC] |
Rep. John James [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2023-01-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-01-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. |
2023-01-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 298. |
2023-01-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-01-30 | House | Mr. McHenry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB294 (Same As) 2023-09-12 - Held at the desk.