US HB2901 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-36)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-289.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-36)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-289.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senator Paul Simon Water for the World Act of 2013 - Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the initial U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) Water and Development Strategy is a significant accomplishment and improves USAID's capacity to provide sustainable and effective water, sanitation, and hygiene assistance; and (2) the Secretary of State, through the Special Advisor for Water Resources, should develop a Global Water Resources Strategy relating to U.S. foreign policy water objectives. Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to direct: (1) the Administrator to designate a Global Water Coordinator to coordinate and oversee water, sanitation, and hygiene assistance; and (2) the Secretary of State to designate a Special Advisor for Water Resources to coordinate and oversee policy relating to water, hygiene, and sanitation assistance. Sets forth principles to ensure that water, sanitation, and hygiene projects carried out under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 and the Senator Paul Simon Water for the Poor Act of 2005 achieve maximum impact. Amends the Senator Paul Simon Water for the Poor Act of 2005 to direct: (1) the President, through the Secretary, to develop a strategy every five years to further the U.S. foreign policy objective to provide affordable and equitable access to safe water and sanitation in developing countries; and (2) the Administrator, through the Global Water Coordinator, to develop a complementary strategy to further the U.S. foreign assistance objective to provide affordable and equitable drinking water, sanitation, and hygiene in developing countries.
Title
Senator Paul Simon Water for the World Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-289. |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6867) |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2014-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-08 | House | On passage Passed without objection. |
2014-12-08 | House | H.AMDT.1155 On agreeing to the Poe (TX) amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-08 | House | H.AMDT.1155 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Poe (TX). (consideration: CR H8854-8856; text: CR H8854-8856)Amendment in the nature of a substitute inserts a complete new text. |
2014-12-08 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H884-8856; text as reported in House: CR H8848-8854) |
2014-12-08 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2014-12-08 | House | Mr. Poe (TX) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2014-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-08-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2013-08-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5265-5266, E1186-1187) |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of State
Executive agency funding and structure
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Solid waste and recycling
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
Water quality
Water use and supply
World health
Department of State
Executive agency funding and structure
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Solid waste and recycling
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
Water quality
Water use and supply
World health