US HB2839 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish regional processing centers, to improve the asylum and credible fear processes to promote fairness and efficiency, to require immigration court docketing priorities during irregular migration influx events, and to improve the capability of the Department of Homeland Security to manage migration flows, and for other purposes.
Title
Bipartisan Border Solutions Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1358 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2173-2175)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2839/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2839/BILLS-117hr2839ih.pdf |