US HB2831 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical amendments to update statutory references to provisions classified to chapters 44, 45, 46, and 47 of title 50, United States Code. This bill makes technical amendments to statutory references to title 50 (War and National Defense) of the U.S. Code, especially with respect to: national security, miscellaneous intelligence community authorities, the Central Intelligence Agency, and the National Security Agency.
Title
To make technical amendments to update statutory references to provisions classified to chapters 44, 45, 46, and 47 of title 50, United States Code.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2016-09-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5051-5056) |
2016-09-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2831. |
2016-09-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5051-5057) |
2016-09-06 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-12-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-12-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |