US HB2815 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for a temporary payment increase under the Medicare program for certain biosimilar biological products to encourage the development and use of such products.
Title
BIOSIM Act Bolstering Innovative Options to Save Immediately on Medicines Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7497 (Related) 2022-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2815/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2815/BILLS-117hr2815ih.pdf |