US HB2758 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the recognition of the Lumbee Tribe of North Carolina, and for other purposes.
Title
Lumbee Recognition Act
Sponsors
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-01 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 357 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 522. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-11-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 59, 1 Present (Roll no. 341). (text: CR H6041) |
2021-11-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6054) |
2021-11-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-11-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2758. |
2021-11-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6041-6043) |
2021-11-01 | House | Ms. Leger Fernandez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1364 (Related) 2021-11-17 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-115.