US SB1364 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-115.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-115.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the recognition of the Lumbee Tribe of North Carolina, and for other purposes.
Title
Lumbee Tribe of North Carolina Recognition Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-115. |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs by unanimous consent. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 50. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2758 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 522.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1364/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1364/BILLS-117s1364pcs.pdf |