US HB2666 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to codify value-based purchasing arrangements under the Medicaid program and reforms related to price reporting under such arrangements, and for other purposes.
Title
MVP Act Medicaid VBPs for Patients Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] |
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Kevin Mullin [D-CA] | Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Glenn Ivey [D-MD] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 19. |
2023-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-17 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 11 . |
2023-05-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2666/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2666/BILLS-118hr2666ih.pdf |