US HB2666 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-29 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-29 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act of 2017 This bill amends the PROTECT Act to reauthorize the AMBER Alert grant program for FY2018. The bill also modifies the program to: make Indian tribes eligible for AMBER Alert grants, permit the use of grant funds to integrate state or regional AMBER Alert communication plans with an Indian tribe, and allow the waiver of the matching funds requirement for grants awarded to Indian tribes.
Title
AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-05-25 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4592) |
2017-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB772 (Same As) 2018-04-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-166. (TXT | PDF)
HB3147 (Same As) 2017-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB3147 (Same As) 2017-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Emergency communications systems
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Emergency communications systems
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2666/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2666/BILLS-115hr2666ih.pdf |