US HB3147 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act of 2017 This bill amends the PROTECT Act to reauthorize the AMBER Alert grant program for FY2018. The bill also modifies the program to: make Indian tribes eligible for AMBER Alert grants, permit the use of grant funds to integrate state or regional AMBER Alert communication plans with an Indian tribe, and allow the waiver of the matching funds requirement for grants awarded to Indian tribes.
Title
AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB772 (Same As) 2018-04-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-166. (TXT | PDF)
HB2666 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2666 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Emergency communications systems
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Emergency communications systems
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3147/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3147/BILLS-115hr3147ih.pdf |