US HB2579 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - S.Amdt.1959 Cloture on amendment SA 1959 not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 39 - 60. Record Vote Number: 36. (CR S1148)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - S.Amdt.1959 Cloture on amendment SA 1959 not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 39 - 60. Record Vote Number: 36. (CR S1148)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Broader Options for Americans Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow the premium assistance tax credit to be used for unsubsidized COBRA continuation health coverage. (Under the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 [COBRA], an individual may continue to receive coverage under an employer-sponsored health plan after an event that would otherwise end coverage, such as a termination of employment. This bill applies to COBRA continuation coverage if the premiums are solely the obligation of the taxpayer.) "COBRA continuation coverage" includes continuation coverage provided under: the Internal Revenue Code, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA), the Public Health Service Act, or the Federal Employees Health Benefits Program; a state law or program that provides comparable coverage; or a church plan that provides comparable coverage. It does not include coverage under a health flexible spending arrangement. For the coverage to qualify for the tax credit, the plan administrator of the group health plan must certify that the COBRA continuation coverage meets the requirements for qualified health plans. The bill is contingent on the enactment of the American Health Care Act of 2017 and applies (if at all) after December 31, 2019.
Title
Broader Options for Americans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Cloture on amendment SA 1955 S.Amdt.1955 RC# 33 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Cloture on amendment SA 1948 S.Amdt.1948 RC# 34 (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Cloture on amendment SA 1958 as modified S.Amdt.1958 RC# 35 (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Cloture on amendment SA 1959 S.Amdt.1959 RC# 36 (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 32 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - On passage RC# 308 (Y: 267 N: 144 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Cloture on amendment SA 1948 S.Amdt.1948 RC# 34 (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Cloture on amendment SA 1958 as modified S.Amdt.1958 RC# 35 (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Cloture on amendment SA 1959 S.Amdt.1959 RC# 36 (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 32 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - On passage RC# 308 (Y: 267 N: 144 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.1959 Cloture on amendment SA 1959 not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 39 - 60. Record Vote Number: 36. (CR S1148) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.1958 Cloture on amendment SA 1958 as modified not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 35. (CR S1147-1148) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.1948 Cloture on amendment SA 1948 not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 34. (CR S1146-1147) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.1955 Cloture on amendment SA 1955 not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 33. (CR S1146) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (CR S1131-1136, S1138-1148) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.1955 Considered by Senate. (CR S1131, S1146) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.1958 Considered by Senate. (CR S1131, S1147-1148) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.1948 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1131, S1146-1147) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.1959 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1131, S1148) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1959 Cloture motion on amendment SA 1959 presented in Senate. (CR S965) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1958 Cloture motion on amendment SA 1958 as modified presented in Senate. (CR S965) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1948 Cloture motion on amendment SA 1948 presented in Senate. (CR S965) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1955 Cloture motion on amendment SA 1955 presented in Senate. (CR S965) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1955 Amendment SA 1955 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Coons to Amendment SA 1958. (consideration: CR S931-932, S965) To provide relief from removal and adjustment of status of certain individuals who are long-term United States residents and who entered the United States before reaching the age of 18, improve border security, foster United States engagement in Central America, and for other purposes. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1958 Amendment SA 1958 proposed by Senator Schumer to language proposed to be stricken by amendment no. 1959. (consideration: CR S931, S959-965; text as modified: CR S959-965) Of a perfecting nature. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1948 Amendment SA 1948 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Toomey to Amendment SA 1959. (consideration: CR S930-931; text: CR S931) To ensure that State and local law enforcement may cooperate with Federal officials to protect our communities from violent criminals and suspected terrorists who are illegally present in the United States. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1959 Amendment SA 1959 proposed by Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S930) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S930-965) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S890-895, S895-903) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 32. (CR S867-868) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S856-868) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the consideration of the measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S849-850) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S849-850) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 302. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2017-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-15 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 267 - 144 (Roll no. 308). (text: CR H4929) |
2017-06-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2579. |
2017-06-15 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2372 and H.R. 2579, with 1 hour of general debate for each bill. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except a motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill. Both measures will be considered read and are closed to amendments. |
2017-06-15 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 379. (consideration: CR H4929-4931) |
2017-06-15 | House | Rule H. Res. 379 passed House. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 379 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2372 and H.R. 2579. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2372 and H.R. 2579, with 1 hour of general debate for each bill. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except a motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill. Both measures will be considered read and are closed to amendments. |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 107. |
2017-06-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-160. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR379 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Income tax credits
Religion
Taxation
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Income tax credits
Religion
Taxation