US HB2577 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secure and Fortify Electronic Data Act or the SAFE Data Act - Requires the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to promulgate regulations requiring any person engaged in interstate commerce that owns or possesses data containing personal information to establish and implement reasonable security policies and procedures to treat and protect such information. Requires such regulations to include specified policies and procedures, including: (1) a process for identifying and assessing vulnerabilities in the system, and (2) a process for taking preventive and corrective action to mitigate such vulnerabilities. Requires a person covered by this Act to establish a plan and procedures for minimizing the amount of personal information maintained. Exempts services providers from such requirements for any electronic communication by a third party that is transmitted, routed, or stored in intermediate or transient storage by the provider. Establishes notification procedures in the event of a breach of security of any system that contains personal information. Allows an exemption from notification requirements if a person subject to this Act determines that there is no reasonable risk of identity theft, fraud, or other unlawful conduct. Creates a presumption that no reasonable risk of such conduct exists following a breach of security if the data containing personal information is unusable, unreadable, or indecipherable to an unauthorized person by encryption or other security technology that is generally accepted by experts in the information security field. Directs a person subject to this Act to provide a credit report and credit monitoring if certain identifying information is breached. Sets forth provisions regarding enforcement of this Act by the FTC and by state attorneys general. Establishes civil penalties for violations. Exempts from the requirements of this Act any person subject to the information security requirements of the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act (HIPAA) or the Gramm-Leach Bliley Act.
Title
SAFE Data Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Bono Mack [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2011-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1707 (Related) 2011-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
HB1841 (Related) 2011-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
SB1207 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1841 (Related) 2011-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
SB1207 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Right of privacy
Telephone and wireless communication
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Right of privacy
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2577/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2577/BILLS-112hr2577ih.pdf |