US HB2564 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Smart Building Acceleration Act Directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to: (1) conduct a survey of privately owned smart buildings throughout the nation, select at least one building each from an appropriate range of building sizes and types, and evaluate the costs and benefits of such buildings using the guidelines of the Federal Energy Management Program relating to whole-building evaluation, measurement, and verification; and (2) establish a program to establish one or more smart buildings under the jurisdiction of the General Services Administration and the Departments of Defense, Energy, and Veterans Affairs to demonstrate and evaluate the costs and benefits of smart buildings. Requires such evaluations to include an identification of which advanced building technologies are most cost-effective and show the most promise for increasing building energy savings, increasing service performance to building occupants, and reducing environmental impacts. Defines a "smart building" to mean a building with an energy system that: is flexible and automated; has extensive operational monitoring and communication connectivity, allowing remote monitoring and analysis of all building functions; is integrated with the overall building operations for control of energy generation, consumption, and storage; and communicates with utilities and other third party commercial entities. Directs DOE: (1) as part of DOE's Better Building Challenge, to develop a smart building accelerator in consultation with major private sector property owners to demonstrate innovative policies and approaches that will accelerate the transition to smart buildings; and (2) to conduct research and development to address key barriers to the integration of advanced building technologies and to accelerate the transition to smart buildings.
Title
Smart Building Acceleration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1046 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
Subjects
Building construction
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Veterans Affairs
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
General Services Administration
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Veterans Affairs
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
General Services Administration
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2564/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2564/BILLS-114hr2564ih.pdf |