US HB256 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 126-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the Authorization for Use of Military Force Against Iraq Resolution of 2002.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To repeal the Authorization for Use of Military Force Against Iraq Resolution of 2002.

Sponsors

Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]
Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD]
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]

Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - House - On passage (Y: 268 N: 161 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 204 N: 219 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2021-06-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-06-17HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 268 - 161 (Roll no. 172). (text: CR H2899)
2021-06-17HouseOn motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 204 - 219 (Roll no. 171).
2021-06-17HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
2021-06-17HouseMr. McCaul moved to recommit to the Committee on Foreign Affairs. (text: CR H2909)
2021-06-17HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2021-06-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 256.
2021-06-17HouseResolution provides for consideration of H.R. 256 under a closed rule and provides for consideration of H.R. 1187 under a structured rule. The resolution provides for one hour of debate for each bill and for one motion to recommit for each bill. The resolution provides that H. Res. 467 is adopted.
2021-06-17HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 473. (consideration: CR H2899-2910)
2021-06-14HouseSupplemental report filed by the Committee on Foreign Affairs, H. Rept. 117-56, Part II.
2021-06-14HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 473 Reported to House. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 256 under a closed rule and provides for consideration of H.R. 1187 under a structured rule. The resolution provides for one hour of debate for each bill and for one motion to recommit for each bill. The resolution provides that H. Res. 467 is adopted.
2021-06-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 39.
2021-06-08HouseReported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 117-56.
2021-03-25HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 19.
2021-03-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-01-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SJR10 (Related) 2021-08-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 117.
HR473 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2716)
HB3261 (Related) 2021-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2391 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback