US SJR10 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-08-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 117.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This joint resolution repeals specified authorizations for the use of military force against Iraq.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution to repeal the authorizations for use of military force against Iraq, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-04SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 117.
2021-08-04SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
2021-08-04SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-07-12SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
2021-03-03SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1030)

Same As/Similar To

HB256 (Related) 2021-06-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB3261 (Related) 2021-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback