HI SB2706 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 731).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 731).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Clean Slate Expungement Task Force to develop a state-initiated record clearing program. Requires the Task Force to submit reports to the Legislature. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Expungement Of Criminal Records.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-24. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-22-24. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-09-24 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 775). |
2024-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Ganaden, Takayama, Souza. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 675). |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Kong, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Woodson excused (3). |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1634-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-28 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-11 | House | Re-referred to JHA, referral sheet 20 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2841) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-27-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1663 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.