US HB2549 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implements requirements concerning child abuse and neglect in Indian tribal communities. Specifically, the bill requires the Government Accountability Office to report on child abuse and neglect in tribal communities for the purpose of making recommendations regarding these issues. Additionally, the Department of Health and Human Services must include Indian tribes and tribal organizations in its equitable distribution of assistance for programs and projects related to child abuse prevention and treatment.
Title
AI/AN CAPTA American Indian and Alaska Native Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1329 (Related) 2019-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
HB2480 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2480 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Domestic violence and child abuse
Government studies and investigations
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Government studies and investigations
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2549/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2549/BILLS-116hr2549ih.pdf |