US HB2480 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-19)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Stronger Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stronger Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2019-05-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-20HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3978-3988)
2019-05-20HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2480.
2019-05-20HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3978-3994)
2019-05-20HouseMs. Schrier moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-20HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 50.
2019-05-20HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 116-74.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2019-05-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1389 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB2549 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SB1329 (Related) 2019-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
SB1446 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback